Governing document The Rawdon Schools Trust: The John Emmott and Francis Layton Endowments
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 13 OCTOBER 1915 AS AMENDED ON THE 16 JANUARY 1995 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1994 AS AMENDED ON 12 OCT 2017 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14 APR 2023 as amended on 11 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED TO THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO PUPILS AND STUDENTS OF FAMILIES WHO ARE DEFINED AS HAVING LOW INCOME. THIS FOR THE PURPOSE OF PURCHASING ITEMS AND PAYING SUBSCRIPTIONS AND SIMILAR, AS REQUIRED TO SUPPORT THEIR EDUCATION. TO BE AWARDED TO PUPILS WHO HAVE LIVED IN RAWDON ITSELF FOR AT LEAST TWO YEARS; ALSO THOSE WHO HAVE LIVED IN THE BROADER AREA DEFINED AS WITHIN THE LEEDS CITY BOUNDARY IN THE POSTCODE LS19 FOR AT LEAST TWO YEARS AND WHO ATTEND STATE SCHOOLS IN RAWDON; ALSO TO STUDENTS IN TERTIARY EDUCATION WHO HAVE LIVED IN RAWDON ITSELF FOR AT LEAST TWO YEARS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.