Trustees The Rawdon Schools Trust: The John Emmott and Francis Layton Endowments
Charity number: 529197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marian Smith | Chair | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rachel Ford | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Thomson | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David James Fearnley | Trustee | 24 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Waddington | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Samuel | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Smith | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.