Governing document ASHVILLE COLLEGE
Charity number: 529577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 DECEMBER 1903 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 5 OCTOBER 1964 AND 2 JUNE 1989 AS MODIFIED BY ORDERS OF 26 AUGUST 1977 AND 20 AUGUST 1982, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 6TH JANUARY 2003 AND SCHEME DATED 10 DECEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 10 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
DAY AND BOARDING SCHOOL FOR THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.