Trustees 9TH PENWORTHAM SCOUT GROUP (ST LEONARD'S)
Charity number: 700552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Freeman | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Hickson | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Hollinghurst | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Murphy | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Margaret Richardson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julian Nicholas Mansfield | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nadya Booth | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER BYRNE TEAGUE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.