Trustees WETHERBY MUSICAL THEATRE GROUP
Charity number: 700570
Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Stewart | Chair | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nia Hopkins | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Hopkins | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Welborn | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon Burdett | Trustee | 06 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Linda Young | Trustee | 06 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Riley | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY LYN | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.