Governing document CANTORES OLICANAE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 SEPTEMBER 1984 AS AMENDED 15 DECEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED ON 20 FEB 2018 AS AMENDED ON 22 JUN 2020 as amended on 29 Apr 2021 as amended on 01 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES; TO MAKE CHORAL MUSIC MORE ACCESSIBLE TO THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.