Governing document Citizens Advice Sandwell & Walsall Ltd
Charity number: 701556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 MARCH 1989 AS AMENDED 11TH JANUARY 2002. as amended on 29 Mar 2017 as amended on 15 Oct 2020 as amended on 01 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
Area of benefit, to be changed to Sandwell, Walsall and surrounding areas
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
SANDWELL METROPOLITAN BOROUGH AND ADJACENT AREAS.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.