Trustees WEST FELTON MEMORIAL HALL (ALSO KNOWN AS WEST FELTON VILLAGE HALL)
Charity number: 702175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID CURTIS | Chair | 25 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Hicks | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deryck Lindsey | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALISON SACRE | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria George | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN WALKER | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN EUNICE HANMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILARY CARYL ILES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE CURTIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAIN ROBERT BUTLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIAN HESKETH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.