Governing document VAUXHALL COMMUNITY LAW AND INFORMATION CENTRE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 MAY 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 8 JANUARY 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 17 MARCH 1998, 7 SEPTEMBER 1998 AND 2 NOVEMBER 1998. as amended on 26 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
(1) RELIEVE PERSONS RESIDENT OR EMPLOYED IN THE VAUXHALL DISTRICT OF LIVERPOOL (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) BY PROVIDING THEM WITH FREE ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE ON ALL LEGAL MATTERS CONCERNING WHICH IT IS NOT PRACTICAL OR APPROPRIATE FOR THEM TO OBTAIN ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE FROM ELSEWHERE OWING TO THEIR FINANCIAL NEED OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; (2) UNDERTAKE OR CO-OPERATE IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS RESIDENT OR EMPLOYED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN THE LAW AND ITS OPERATION; (3) ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY FOR PERSONS WORKING OR RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT;
Area of benefit
VAUXHALL DISTRICT OF LIVERPOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.