Trustees QUEEN ELIZABETH I FOUNDATION PRIZES FUND
Charity number: 702868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAYMOND KIRBY | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Rogers | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|||||
JOHN STUART SMITH | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Geoffrey Philip Thorp | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD WILLIAMS | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|||||
MADELINE ROSETTA CRESSWELL | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Peter John HOLDEN | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Caroline Edith Anne Boughton-Thomas | Trustee | 31 December 2019 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL JAMES CUPPER | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.