Charity overview THE GRICE ANNUITIES
Charity number: 212450-2
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF HIGH COURT OF 13 NOVEMBER 1912 AND SCHEMES OF 3 APRIL 1914 30 SEPT. 1947 AND 11 JUNE 1954
Charitable objects
ANNUITIES TO DISTRESSED LADIES
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Registration history
- 14 May 1963: Standard registration
- 26 July 2007: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.