Governing document FIRST RUNG LTD
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30TH SEPTEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 6TH JANUARY 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 28TH SEPTEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 18TH MARCH 2003 AND 23 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING. 2. FOR THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, RETRAINING AND PERIODS OF WORK EXPERIENCE, THROUGH THE PROGRAMMES OF THE LEARNING AND SKILLS COUNCIL, THEIR SUCCESSORS OR SIMILAR PROGRAMMES FUNDED BY THE GOVERNMENT AND PUBLIC AGENCIES INCLUDING THE EUROPEAN UNION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE ENFIELD LB
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.