Trustees HEARTBEAT EAST SUFFOLK
Charity number: 800632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL FARTHING | Chair |
|
|
|||||
LYNN PATRICIA OSBORNE | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE RICHARD OSBORNE | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
DEREK JOHN SPALDING | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
IAN ROBERT PANTING | Trustee | 02 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA FOUNTAIN | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE CHITTOCK | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
DENISE THERESA PARMENTER | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
KAY YVONNE BURTON | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN PARMENTER | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANNE TIBBS | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROL NUNN | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BIGGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NORMA FARTHING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN PATRICK CUCKOW | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.