Accounts and annual returns AGE CONCERN STOKE POGES
Charity number: 800635
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | 01 December 2008 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | 10 December 2008 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | 14 September 2007 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | 17 October 2006 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | 14 December 2005 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2004 | 07 December 2004 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2004 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window