Trustees THE ELLESMERE CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 801728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANDRA MARIA WILSON | Chair | 30 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Julie Armour | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Groves | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Courtenay-Moore | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALAN SHARP | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANE MADSEN | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Faircloth | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
LINDA DICKER | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER MILLS | Trustee | 13 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
LILY PAMELA WHYMER | Trustee | 30 August 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.