Dogfen lywodraethu BRITISH MALIGNANT HYPERTHERMIA ASSOCIATION
Rhif yr elusen: 1007739
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 OCTOBER 1989 AS AMENDED 5 OCTOBER 1991, 21 SEPTEMBER 2002 AND 27 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY A SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 1ST FEBRUARY 2005
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF INDIVIDUALS AFFECTED BY MALIGNANT HYPERTHERMIA
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.