Dogfen lywodraethu THE HARROW UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/03/1992 AS AMENDED ON 28/09/1995 AS AMENDED ON 24/04/1997 AS AMENDED ON 06/10/1998 AS AMENDED ON 14/10/2005 AS AMENDED ON 05/03/2013 AS AMENDED ON 06 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 13 Mar 2025
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Maes buddion
HARROW AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.