Dogfen lywodraethu THE INTERNATIONAL HERMENEUTIC SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 23/09/1971 AS AMENDED 29/01/1995 AS AMENDED 24/01/1999 AS AMENDED 28/01/2001 AS AMENDED 26/01/2003 AS AMENDED 31/01/2016 as amended on 07 Oct 2018 as amended on 20 Mar 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE RESEARCH AND STUDY INTO SPIRITUAL PSYCHOLOGICAL AND SCIENTIFIC KNOWLEDGES FOR THE PURPOSE OF DISCOVERING PRINCIPLES FOR THE PRACTICAL IMPROVEMENT AND THE SPIRITUAL AND PHYSICAL WELL-BEING OF MANKIND AND TO TEACH AND OTHERWISE PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE DISSEMINATION TO THE PUBLIC OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AND STUDY AND FOR THAT PURPOSE TO PROVIDE LIBRARIES STUDY CENTRES AND OTHER SUITABLE PLACES WHERE SUCH RESEARCH STUDY TEACHING ANDDISSEMINATION AS AFORESAID MAY BE CONDUCTED OR CARRIED ON.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.