Dogfen lywodraethu THE COLLEGE OF PHARMACY PRACTICE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15TH DECEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 04 MARCH 1981, 04 NOVEMBER 1981, 09 APRIL 1987, 20 NOVEMBER 1994, 23 JUNE 2005 AND 24 JUNE 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE COLLEGE IS ESTABLISHED TO PROMOTE AND MAINTAIN A HIGH STANDARD OF PHARMACY PRACTICE AD IN PARTICULAR (A) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINGING OF PHARMACISTS IN ALL BRANCHES OF PHARMACY PRACTICE AND AT ALL LEVELS; (B) TO ESTABLISH STANDARDS FOR VOCATIONAL TRAINING IN PHARMACY PRACTICE; (C) TO ADVANCE KNOWLEDGE OF THE APPLICATION OF PHARMACY IN TOTAL HELATE APPLICATION OF PHARMACY IN TOTAL HEALTH CARE; (D) TO CONDUCT PROMOTE AND FACILITATE RESEARCH INTO PHARMACY PRACTICE AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.