Dogfen lywodraethu HARTCLIFFE COMMUNITY PARK FARM LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 FEBRUARY 1987, AS AMENDED 13 JANUARY 1988, 16 AUGUST 1988, 25 AUGUST 2006 AND 28 NOVEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25 SEPTEMBER 2006.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3(A) TO ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF YOUNG UNEMPLOYED PERSONS RESIDENT IN HARTCLIFFE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT"). (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, PARTICULARLY YOUNG PEOPLE, IN AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, HOMECRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT THROUGH BEST ENVIRONMENTAL PRACTICES, ESPECIALLY BY ENCOURAGING REDUCTION, REUSE AND RECYCLING AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND IN THE PRINCIPLES OF SELF DISCIPLINE AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND THROUGH THEIR LEISURE ACTIVITIES SO THAT THEY DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES AND GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. (C) TO PROMOTE HUMANITY AND MORALITY AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY EDUCATING THEM IN THE CARE AND CONSIDERATION OF ALL ANIMALS, PARTICULARLY ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION, AND FOR THESE PURPOSES TO CARE FOR AND EXHIBIT ANIMALS IN COMMON AGRICULTURAL AND DOMESTIC USE SO THAT THE PUBLIC AND PARTICULARLY YOUNG PEOPLE WILL LEARN A GREATER AWARENESS OF APPRECIATION FOR SUCH ANIMALS. (D) TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, YOUTH, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. SO AS TO PREPARE THEM FOR ANY TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE AND THEREBY ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE TO ENABLE THEM TO EARN THEIR OWN LIVELIHOOD. (E) TO RELIEVE PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY DISABLED RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF REMEDIAL, RECREATIONAL OR THERAPEUTIC ACTIVITY FACILITIES, SUBJECT WHERE APPROPRIATE TO THE CONSENT OF THE MEDICAL ADVISERS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Maes buddion
HARTCLIFFE IN THE COUNTY OF AVON
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.