Dogfen lywodraethu THE ASSOCIATION OF VISITORS TO IMMIGRATION DETAINEES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/05/1997 AS AMENDED ON 22/09/2001 AS AMENDED ON 31/05/2003 AS AMENDED ON 16/04/2005 AS AMENDED ON 29/03/2008 AS AMENDED ON 09/12/2010 AS AMENDED ON 28/06/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF IMMIGRANTS AND REFUGEES WHO ARE SUFFERING HARDSHIP, DISTRESS OR ARE IN NEED, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE, BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, TO THOSE WHO ARE IMPRISONED OR DETAINED UNDER IMMIGRATION LEGISLATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHETHER IN DETENTION CENTRES, HOLDING CENTRES, PRISONS OR POLICE STATIONS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.