Trosolwg o'r elusen THE UNITED RELIGIONS INITIATIVE (UK)
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The Charity was incorporated on 6/6/2008 (Company Number: 6613407) and received a new charity registration number: 1124863 on 7/7/2008. During the period 1st November 2007 - 31st October 2008 the Trustees have sought to raise funds to promote the purpose of URI UK and more particularly educate the public, advance religion, theology and spirituality and the development of interfaith understanding a
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 October 2008
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.