Dogfen lywodraethu HERTS PEOPLE FIRST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/05/2001 AS AMENDED ON 02/03/2002 AS AMENDED ON 10/12/2005 AS AMENDED ON 11/11/2006 AS AMENDED ON 25/01/2010 AS AMENDED ON 28/06/2013 as amended on 28 Mar 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES LIVING OR WORKING IN HERTFORDSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS THROUGH SERVICES WHICH ENABLE PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES TO OBTAIN THEIR FULL RIGHTS AND PRIVILEGES AS CITIZENS B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OR PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, PROFESSIONALS, CARERS AND THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES SO PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES MAY ACHIEVE FULL PARTICIPATION IN THE COMMUNITY
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.