Dogfen lywodraethu NEW LINX HOUSING TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
INCORPORATED 02/04/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/02/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/12/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22/02/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15/09/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1 TO PROVIDE HOUSING OR ACCOMMODATION TOGETHER WITH ANY ASSOCIATED SERVICES AND AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, INCLUDING POOR PEOPLE, THE ELDERLY, PERSONS EXPERIENCING INFIRMITY WHETHER MENTAL OR PHYSICAL, OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE, UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; 2 TO PROVIDE FOR ELDERLY OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE OR PEOPLE WITH A DISABILITY (INCLUDING MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND LEARNING OR ASSOCIATED DISABILITIES) IN NEED THEREOF HOMES OR HOSTELS SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS AND TO PROVIDE ASSOCIATED AMENITIES ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE; 3 TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREAS IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK; 4 TO PROVIDE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREAS IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK; 5 TO MAINTAIN, IMPROVE OR PROVIDE PUBLIC AMENITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE INTERESTS OF REGENERATION IN AREAS IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE LINCOLNSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.