Dogfen lywodraethu PWYLLGOR CANOLFAN GYMUNEDOL LLANWNDA
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/04/2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15/08/2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09/01/2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06/10/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE COMMUNITY OF LLANWNDA, GWYNEDD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Maes buddion
LLANWNDA, GWYNEDD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.