Dogfen lywodraethu FOUNDATION FOR KNOWLEDGE EXCHANGE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 AUG 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 OCT 2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26 JUN 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PARTICULARLY IN SCIENCE, HEALTH, SOCIAL SCIENCE AND THE HUMANITIES, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE BUT, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY ORGANISING CONFERENCES AND MEETINGS, SUPPORTING RESEARCH AND DISSEMINATING THE RESULTS OF RESEARCH
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.