Dogfen lywodraethu CORNERSTONE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 17 JUNE 1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED THE 19 MAY 1983 8 MAY 1985 AND 10 JUNE 1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 23 SEPTEMBER 2004
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED IS:- TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND AS AN EXPRESSION OF CHRISTIAN WITNESS, LOVE AND CONCERN TO UNDERTAKE ANY OR ALL OF THE FOLLOWING: 1 TO PROVIDE AND/OR SUPPORT TRAINING, EDUCATION AND PASTORAL CARE PARTICULARLY OF YOUNG PERSONS: 2. TO PROVIDE AND/OR SUPPORT FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OR RECREATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY: 3. TO PROVIDE HOUSES, HOSTELS OR ANY OTHER HOUSING ACCOMMODATION AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES, SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS: 4. TO PROVIDE THE SAME FOR ANY OTHER PERSONS FOR WHOM IT WOULD BE CHARITABLE TO DO SO: 5. TO RELIEVE THE AGED, THE POOR, THE SICK AND THOSE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.