Dogfen lywodraethu THE FRIENDS OF THE LANCASHIRE YOUTH AND SCHOOLS CONCERT BANDS
Rhif yr elusen: 511968
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 OCTOBER 1981 AS AMENDED 18 APRIL 1989, 9 APRIL 1994, 6 MARCH 2004 AND 16 OCTOBER 2010.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE, ADVANCE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE LANCASHIRE YOUTH CONCERT BAND (L.Y.C.B.) AND THE LANCASHIRE SCHOOLS CONCERT BAND (L.S.C.B.) IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN SUCH WAYS AS THE ASSOCIATION SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME. THE OBJECTS SHALL AT ALL TIMES BE NON - POLITICAL.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.