Dogfen lywodraethu CRESCENT ARTS
Rhif yr elusen: 513099

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MARCH 1981 AS AMENDED 4 AUGUST 1982, 8 SEPTEMBER 1982, 6 OCTOBER 1982, SCHEME OF 27 JANUARY 1989, 22 MAY 1998 AND 4 OCTOBER 1999.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF ARTISTIC TASTE AND AN INTEREST, KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AMONGST THE INHABITANTS OF SCARBOROUGH AND BEYOND. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
SCARBOROUGH AND BEYOND
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.