Dogfen lywodraethu DUDLEY OLYMPICS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 SEPTEMBER 1986 AS AMENDED 4 JUNE 1991, 29 NOVEMBER 1994, 1 DECEMBER 98 AND 21 AUGUST 2001. AS AMENDED ON 01 AUG 2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO ENCOURAGE,PROMOTE AND DEVELOP SPORT AND RECREATION AMONGST MENTALLY HANDICAPPED PEOPLE IN THE DUDLEY OLYMPICS AND SO TO ENABLE THEM TO COMPETE WITH EACH OTHER AND WITH ABLE BODIED PEOPLE. 2) TO ENDEAVOUR TO SECURE THE PROVISION AND IMPROVEMENT OF FACILITIES FOR SPORT AND RECREATION FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED PEOPLE BY LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND OTHER CONTROLLING BODIES. 3) TO MAKE KNOWN TO MENTALLY HANDICAPPED PEOPLE ,PARENTS AND GUARDIANS THE BENEFITS OF RECREATIONAL PURSUITS AND SPORTING ACTIVITIES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.