Dogfen lywodraethu HANSEL AND GRETEL SUPPORT GROUP
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 OCTOBER 1972 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS OF 10 NOVEMBER 1980, 5 JANUARY 1987 AND 6 DECEMBER 2006 AND BY ORDER OF 29 DECEMBER 2006.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS IN TRANSITION TO ADULT LIFE, WITH DISABILITIES AND/OR SPECIAL NEEDS, WHO LIVE IN OR RECEIVE TREATMENT, EDUCATION OR OTHER CARE IN THE WYRE FOREST AREA, AND THAT OF THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, BY EDUCATING, ADVISING OR ASSISTING PARENTS AND CARERS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING DEVELOPMENT OF MUTUAL SUPPORT NETWORKS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE WYRE FOREST
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.