Dogfen lywodraethu THIRD HERITAGE FELLOWSHIP
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 NOV 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 DEC 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 FEB 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 MAY 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 JUN 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 AUG 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 NOV 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 NOV 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, IN PARTICULAR BY: I) RAISING AWARENESS OF AND PROVIDING EDUCATION ON ISLAM FOR ANY MEMBER OF THE PUBLIC WITH AN ACTIVE INTEREST IN THE FAITH; II) PROMOTING THE EDUCATION AND WELLBEING OF CONVERTS TO THE FAITH; III) PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR COMMUNITY SERVICE PERSONNEL OFFERING SUPPORT FOR CONVERTS TO THE FAITH IN THE UK AND ELSEWHERE; AND IN SO DOING, TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMONY WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM. (B) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES THAT ARE CONSISTENT WITH THE ABOVE AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.