Dogfen lywodraethu THE CHEPSTOW MALE VOICE CHOIR/COR MEIBION CAS-GWENT

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/06/1988 AS AMENDED ON 12/01/1989 AS AMENDED ON 01/12/2005 AS AMENDED ON 26/03/2012 AS AMENDED ON 25/04/2013 AS AMENDED ON 24/04/2014 as amended on 26 Apr 2018 as amended on 26 Apr 2018 as amended on 25 Apr 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE AND FOSTER THE GENERAL PUBLIC'S INTEREST IN AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS AND PARTICULARLY THE DEVELOPMENT AND WIDER PERFORMANCE OF MALE CHORAL WORKS WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.