Dogfen lywodraethu BIRMINGHAM CHRISTIAN COLLEGE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 NOVEMBER 1988 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 26 JUNE 1995, 20 MAY 2005 AND 20 JULY 2009 as amended on 20 May 2020 as amended on 20 May 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(i) To promote the advancement of the Christian faith in the United Kingdom and elsewhere by spreading the Gospel of the Lord Jesus Christ. (ii) To provide education and training in the knowledge, understanding and practice of the Christian faith, and in such other subjects which are complementary to the students theological training as the trustees see fit, and to do all such things as are necessary to the attainment of that object.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.