Dogfen lywodraethu FRIENDS OF LANTERNS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MARCH 1972 AS AMENDED 22 MARCH 1977, 30 NOVEMBER 2000 AND 30 OCTOBER 2007 AS AMENDED ON 16 JUN 2016 as amended on 12 Jun 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The charity’s objects are to ensure the advancement of education and care of all pre school children including children with special needs under statutory school age in the area of benefit and in furtherance of the object but not otherwise the Charity shall: a) Support the work of Lanterns Nursery School through provision of equipment to support the education and care of pupils and the effective working of the school b) Provision of targeted support to disadvantaged pupils and families to enable children to access early education and support their wellbeing so that they are able to benefit from the learning opportunities provided by the school c) Provision of targeted support to pupils with special needs and disabilities to enable children to access early education and support their wellbeing so that they are able to benefit from the learning opportunities provided by the school d) Promote activities that empower parents, carers and extended family members to support the learning and development of their pre-school children
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE WINCHESTER.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.