Dogfen lywodraethu PICKER INSTITUTE EUROPE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/01/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/07/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/05/2004 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21/03/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/04/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO PROMOTE PUBLIC HEALTH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN PARTICULAR BY IMPROVING STANDARDS OF TREATMENT AND CARE FOR PATIENTS OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES; 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN HEALTH CARE IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING FOR HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONALS IN COMMUNICATION SKILLS; AND 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN HEALTH CARE IN PARTICULAR BY DEVELOPING RESEARCH TOOLS AND UNDERTAKING RESEARCH INTO PATIENTS' PERSPECTIVES OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THE SAME FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.