Financial history THE ENVIRONMENTAL AWARENESS TRUST

Charity number: 1000042
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2012 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016
Total gross income £1.04k £3.26k £1.16k £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.84k £1.77k £1.48k £691 £941
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0