Accounts and annual returns PERUVIAN LADIES ASSOCIATION OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 1001110
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 September 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 29 September 2011 27 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2011 Not Required
Annual return 29 September 2010 27 July 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2010 Not Required
Annual return 29 September 2009 06 May 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2009 Not Required