Financial history PERUVIAN LADIES ASSOCIATION OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 1001110
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/09/2007 29/09/2008 29/09/2009 29/09/2010 29/09/2011
Total gross income £7.20k £6.18k £5.29k £16.23k £8.69k
Total expenditure £7.44k £9.71k £5.35k £15.84k £4.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A