Accounts and annual returns WEST BIRMINGHAM CROSSROADS CARE ATTENDANT SCHEME

Charity number: 1001416
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 16 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 17 November 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 20 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 24 September 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 24 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 01 October 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 06 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 27 September 2006 On Time