Financial history WEST BIRMINGHAM CROSSROADS CARE ATTENDANT SCHEME

Charity number: 1001416
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £446.06k £519.50k £687.82k £1.04m £999.71k
Total expenditure £428.56k £547.60k £655.57k £806.16k £1.03m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £1.60k £3.35k £5.87k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £2.43k £2.30k £2.25k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £679.24k £1.02m £981.52k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £3.75k £5.93k £9.08k
Income - Other N/A N/A £804 £1.12k £996
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £653.29k £803.48k £1.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £1.69k £2.05k £2.11k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0