Accounts and annual returns VICTORIA ROAD SCHOOL PARENTS GROUP

Charity Number: 1002337
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2009 07 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2008 26 August 2009 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required