Financial history MONKS KIRBY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1003574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £12.03k £12.54k £28.52k £61.52k £15.54k
Total expenditure £11.48k £4.57k £3.64k £94.14k £12.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.66k £10.00k £1.19k £2.67k £349