Financial history u3a in Bath

Charity number: 1004449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £83.56k £5.74k £21.99k £55.41k £63.08k
Total expenditure £82.17k £14.85k £22.03k £58.35k £65.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A