Accounts and annual returns THE EDWARD LLOYD TRUST

Charity number: 1005124
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 April 2018 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 25 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 25 August 2016 On Time