Financial history THE EDWARD LLOYD TRUST

Charity number: 1005124
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/05/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £2.84m £2.75m £2.65m £3.19m £0
Total expenditure £2.78m £2.84m £2.85m £3.30m £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £2.37m £2.81m £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £44.13k £0 £0
Income - Donations and legacies £131.94k £84.13k £76.62k £83.31k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £2.71m £2.66m £2.57m £3.11m N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £3.21k £6.23k £5.68k £419 N/A
Income - Other £3.13k £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.77m £2.83m £2.84m £3.30m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £6.48k £7.09k £6.86k £7.86k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A