Financial history UMBRELLA

Charity number: 1006778
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £4.44m £4.74m £4.74m £4.82m £4.83m
Total expenditure £4.43m £4.53m £4.46m £4.40m £4.42m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £102.84k £62.27k £50.72k £23.24k £38.18k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.29m £4.56m £4.53m £4.70m £4.75m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £48.17k £79.19k £76.83k £39.85k £35.00k
Income - Other £0 £46.57k £88.06k £59.09k £8.52k
Income - Legacies £11.19k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.37m £4.46m £4.42m £4.38m £4.36m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £23.23k £54.33k £26.70k £24.16k £27.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0