Accounts and annual returns THE HOLBORN LAW SOCIETY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1009674
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 16 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 16 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 05 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 06 November 2009 279 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required