Financial history THE HOLBORN LAW SOCIETY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1009674
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £453 £425 £400 £208 £400
Total expenditure £453 £425 £400 £208 £400
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A