Accounts and annual returns EAST MIDLANDS MUSEUMS SERVICE

Charity number: 1009683
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 August 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 November 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 November 2018 On Time